Search
• Merry Havens

# Rapid Math Tricks Multiply by 11

Updated: Oct 25, 2019

We first learned how easy it is to multiply single digits by 11....easy: 2 x 11 is 22. 8 x 11 is 88.

But what do we do when we have 2 digit numbers to multiply by 11? Well, it turns out to be just as easy! 32 x 11 is 352 and 45 x 11 is 495....see a pattern here?

For 32 x 11, put the sum of 3 and 2 (5) between 3 and 2, and for 45 x 11, put the sum of 4 and 5 (9) between 4 and 5. So, let's try a couple:

1. 27 x 11 =

2. 34 x 11 =

3. 51 x 11 =

4. 63 x 11 =

5. 81 x 11 =

get it?

1. 297 the sum of 2 and 7 (9) between 2 and 7

2. 374 the sum of 3 and 4 (7) between 3 and 4

3. 561 the sum of 5 and 1 (6) between 5 and 1

4. 693 the sum of 6 and 3 (9) between 6 and 3

5. 891 the sum of 8 and 1 (9) between 8 and 1

Amaze your friends and family by showing them this trick.

What to do in the case where the 2 digits add up to more than 9? Just carry the 1.

For example: 39 x 11 is (3 + 9 in the middle 12...put down the 2 carry the 1 to the 3) so the answer is 429....easy, right?

## Recent Posts

See All

#### Solving Linear Equations

Linear equations come in many forms. Easy conversion between the different forms can come in very useful for solving linear equations and graphing. Slope Intercept form: y = mx + b where m is

#### Solving 2 variable equations

There are basically 2 types of 2-variable equations you will be asked to solve. The first type is asking, what is y when x is _____? For example, for the linear equation y = 3x + 4....what is y whe

#### Solving single variable problems (basic algebra)

A single variable equation looks something like this: 3 x + 4 = 2x + 12 or this: x^2 = 144 Here are some foundations you need: 1. know orders of operations (GEMS or PEMDAS). That means, you